This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 19:55:46 (UTC).

LEVIN & MARGOLIN VS GOSS, MARINE MARIE

Case Summary

On 08/05/2013 LEVIN MARGOLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GOSS, MARINE MARIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0643

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

Defendant

GOSS MARINE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JEFFREY SKLAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/02/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • OSC SET 08/05/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVIN & MARGOLIN is a litigant