This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 04:09:30 (UTC).

LETR, INC. VS HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 LETR, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PHILIP K. MAUTINO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6606

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

PHILIP K. MAUTINO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LETR INC. DBA SUNSET BODY WORKS

Defendant

HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/25/2018: Unknown

Fictitious Business Name Attached

6/13/2018: Fictitious Business Name Attached

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 08/16/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Court Order scheduled for 07/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/12/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: House of Finance Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Motion for Change of Venue; Filed by: House of Finance Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: LETR, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: House of Finance Corp. (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/20/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LETR, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: House of Finance Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Philip K. Mautino in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Fictitious Business Statement: Name Extension: Fictitious Business Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Fictitious Business Name Attached: Name Extension changed from Fictitious Business Statement to Fictitious Business Name Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where LETR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant