Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 14:35:04 (UTC).

LETICIA MARTINEZ VS J. GUADALUPE GONZALEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 LETICIA MARTINEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against J GUADALUPE GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7503

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ LETICIA

Defendants

GONZALEZ J. GUADALUPE

GONZALEZ EFREN

EPAZOTE #1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

ISLA JORGE FERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer First Amended

4/20/2021: Answer - Answer First Amended

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

2/16/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility

4/15/2021: Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

11/3/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility

10/19/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/19/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/19/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

10/29/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • Hearing07/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibility Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER STAY PROCEEDINGS; Filed by: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); As to: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); As to: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer First Amended; Filed by: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); As to: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); As to: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Construction Related Accessibility Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEarly Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibility Claim) scheduled for 07/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketApplication for Mandatory Evaluation Conference Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 55.545; Filed by: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); Efren Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); Efren Gonzalez (Defendant); Epazote #1 LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); Efren Gonzalez (Defendant); Epazote #1 LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (Defendant); Efren Gonzalez (Defendant); Epazote #1 LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Leticia Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC07503    Hearing Date: April 15, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., April 15, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Martinez v. Gonzalez COMPL. FILED: 09-03-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC07503 DEFAULT: 10-09-20

NOTICE: OK DEF. JDGMT: 11-03-20

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY: Defendants J. Guadalupe Gonzalez Efren Gonzalez, and Epazote #1, LLC

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants J. Guadalupe Gonzalez, Efren Gonzalez, and Epazote #1, LLC’s Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment is GRANTED. The default entered on October 9, 2020 and default judgment entered on November 3, 2020 against Defendants are HEREBY VACATED. Defendants are ordered to file their proposed answer within ten (10) days of notice of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of April 13, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of April 13, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On September 3, 2020, Plaintiff Leticia Martinez (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for violation of the Unruh Civil Rights Act against Defendants J. Guadalupe Gonzalez (“J. Guadalupe”), Efren Gonzalez (“Efren”), and Epazote #1, LLC (“Epazote”) (collectively, “Defendants”).

Default was entered against Defendants on October 19, 2020. Later that evening, Defendants Efren and J. Guadalupe attempted to file an Answer, which was not accepted as filed by the Court.

On October 29, 2020, Defendants filed the instant Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed. On November 3, 2020, a default judgment of $5,225.00 was entered against Defendants. (11/3/20 Default Judgment.)

The Court continued the initial February 10, 2021 hearing because Defendants failed to include a proof of service demonstrating Plaintiff was given adequate notice of the Motion. (2/10/21 Minute Order.)

Defendants refiled their Motion on February 16, 2021 with a proof of service demonstrating it was served on Plaintiff on February 11, 2021 via regular mail. (2/16/21 Mot., Proof of Service.) No opposition was filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

Defendants seek relief pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b). (2/16/21 Mot., p. 1:22-27.) Under this statute, an application for relief must be made no more than six months after entry of the judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding from which relief is sought and must be accompanied by an affidavit of fault attesting to the mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect of the moving party or its attorney. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b); English v. IKON Business Solutions (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 130, 143.)

Defendants’ Motion is timely. Defendants seek relief from the default and the resulting default judgment entered against them due to Defendants’ counsel’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect. (2/16/21 Am. Mot., p. 1:22-27; p. 2:8-9; p: 7-9.) Specifically, Defendant’s counsel explains that his paralegal failed to enter on the office calendar the correct date on which the answer was due. (Id., Fernandez Isla Decl., ¶ 1; Garcia Decl., p. 6:11-27.) As a result, the answer was not timely filed. (Id.)

Based on the timely request to vacate the default and resulting default judgment supported by an attorney affidavit of fault, the unopposed Motion is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendants J. Guadalupe Gonzalez, Efren Gonzalez, and Epazote #1, LLC’s Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment is GRANTED. The default entered on October 9, 2020 and default judgment entered on November 3, 2020 against Defendants are HEREBY VACATED. Defendants are ordered to file their proposed answer within ten (10) days of notice of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STLC07503    Hearing Date: February 10, 2021    Dept: 25


Case Number: 21STLC00586    Hearing Date: February 10, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., February 10, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Brophy v. Bixby Hill Gardens HOA et al. COMPL. FILED: 01-21-21

CASE NUMBER: 21STLC00586 DISC. C/O: 06-21-22

NOTICE: OK MOTION C/O: 07-06-22

TRIAL DATE: 07-21-22

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff James Brophy

RESP. PARTY: Defendant Bixby Gardens Homeowners Association

MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

(CCP § 526)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff James Brophy’s Motion for Preliminary Injunction is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Because this Court does not have jurisdiction to issue permanent injunctive relief as prayed for in the Complaint, the action is RECLASSIFIED as an unlimited jurisdiction case and is transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on February 5, 2021 [X] Late [ ] None

REPLY: Filed on February 8, 2021 [X] Late [   ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

Plaintiff James Brophy (“Plaintiff”) filed this action for a permanent injunction and monetary damages against Defendant Bixby Hill Gardens Homeowners Association (the “Bixby HOA”) and Bixby Hill Gardens Board of Directors (“Bixby BOD”) (collectively, “Defendants”) on January 21, 2021.

On January 22, 2021, Plaintiff filed an ex parte application for a temporary restraining order. The Court granted the ex parte application on January 26 and enjoined Defendants, their employees, agents, and/or any other persons acting with them or on their behalf from removing or causing to be removed any plants, flowers, trees, or other planted material from the common area located in front of 932 Palo Verde Ave., Long Beach, Ca 90815. (1/26/21 Minute Order.) The parties were also ordered to meet and confer in good faith on a possible resolution of this matter no later than five (5) days before the next hearing. (Id.)

Also on January 26, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Preliminary Injunction (the “Motion”). Defendant Bixby HOA filed an opposition on February 5, and Plaintiff filed a Reply on February 8.

As an initial matter, the Court notes that limited jurisdiction courts, such as this one, do not possess the authority to issue permanent injunctive relief. (Code Civ. Proc., § 86, subd. (a)(8) [“An action to issue a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction” is a limited civil case].) (Emphasis added.) Because this action seeks permanent injunctive relief, the Court does not have jurisdiction over the case. Accordingly, the Court reclassifies this action to unlimited jurisdiction court on its own motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 403.040, subdivision (a). Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff James Brophy’s Motion for Preliminary Injunction is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Because this Court does not have jurisdiction to issue permanent injunctive relief as prayed for in the Complaint, the action is RECLASSIFIED as an unlimited jurisdiction case and is transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.