Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2017 at 08:35:53 (UTC).

LETICIA ARCHUNDIA NAJERA, ( PASSENGER ) VS ALEXIS CELEST BARRAGAN, (DRIVER), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 LETICIA ARCHUNDIA NAJERA, PASSENGER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEXIS CELEST BARRAGAN, DRIVER . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAJERA LETICIA ARCHUNDIA PASSENGER

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendants

BARRAGAN GEORGE DANIEL OWNER

Los Angeles, CA 90022

BARRAGAN ALEXIS CELEST DRIVER

Los Angeles, CA 90022

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/13/2017: Unknown

(Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

12/13/2017: (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2017

12/13/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/13/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

(Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

12/12/2017: (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/12/2017

12/12/2017: Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/12/2017

(Amended)

12/11/2017: (Amended)

(Court Order)

12/11/2017: (Court Order)

Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/11/2017

12/11/2017: Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/11/2017

Unknown

11/29/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/22/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/13/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 12/13/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 12/13/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - Clerical Error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Leticia Archundia Najera ( Passenger ) against Defendant Alexis Celest Barragan (Driver) and Defendant George Daniel Barragan (Owner) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Leticia Archundia Najera, ( Passenger ) on 10/18/2017 for the principal amount of $3,332.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $3,432.00, joint and several.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/13/2017 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Leticia Archundia Najera, ( Passenger ) (Plaintiff); Alexis Celest Barragan, (Driver) (Defendant); George Daniel Barragan, (Owner) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/13/2017 08:30 AM at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Amended Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Leticia Archundia Najera, ( Passenger ) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Leticia Archundia Najera, ( Passenger ) (Plaintiff); As to: Alexis Celest Barragan, (Driver) (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/08/17; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Leticia Archundia Najera, ( Passenger ) (Plaintiff); As to: Alexis Celest Barragan, (Driver) (Defendant); George Daniel Barragan, (Owner) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less