This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2016 at 08:06:54 (UTC).

LEMOLI AVENUE H.O.A. VS. ABBY, SHEILA D

Case Summary

On 11/08/2012 LEMOLI AVENUE H O A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ABBY, SHEILA D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STUART GARRISON and ATHIN EFTEKHARI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2112

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STUART GARRISON

ATHIN EFTEKHARI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMOLI AVENUE H.O.A.

Defendant

ABBY SHEILA D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/28/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE STORED IN BOX #54 SET FOR DESTRUCTION ON 04/28/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. DES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA12S02112 TO ING12ST2112

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 008 , HON. STUART GARRISON, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON COURT ORDER COMPLIANCE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 008 RE: ON CALENDAR FOR 3-21-13 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 008 , HON. ATHIN EFTEKHARI, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON COURT ORDER COMPLIANCE: MATTER CONTINUED TO 03/21/13 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 008 . PARTIES REACHED A SETTLEMENT. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 664.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LEMOLI AVENUE H.O.A.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 008 RE: ON CALENDAR FOR 12-20-12 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ABBY, SHEILA D) BY SUB-SERVING LUPE MARTINEZ . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/20/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 008 COSTS OF $ 90.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1121109E1718. HEARING SET FOR 12/20/12 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEMOLI AVENUE HOMEWONERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant