This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2016 at 21:21:51 (UTC).

LEMOLI AVENUE HOA VS ABBEY, SHEILA D.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2013 LEMOLI AVENUE HOA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ABBEY, SHEILA D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN, NICOLE C. BERS and JOHN L. MASON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0676

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

NICOLE C. BERS

JOHN L. MASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMOLI AVENUE HOA

Defendant

ABBEY SHEILA D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 04:30P M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. JOHN L. MASON PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. NICOLE C. BERSHON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED. MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/04/13 AT 04:30P M, IN DEPT. 006 . NIGHT COURT SESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (ABBEY, SHEILA D.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/26/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # ING484702002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LEMOLI AVENUE HOA) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. COMMISSIONER STEVEN L. BERMAN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/23/13 . FOR (LEMOLI AVENUE HOA) . AGAINST (ABBEY, SHEILA D.) . PRINCIPAL $ 2061.52 . COSTS $ 185.00 . TOTAL $ 2246.52 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ABBEY, SHEILA D.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ABBEY, SHEILA D.) BY SUB-SERVING {LUPE MARTINEZ} . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/23/13 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 COSTS OF $ 135.00 . {AMENDED}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ABBEY, SHEILA D.) BY SUB-SERVING {DELIA CERVANTES} . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/23/13 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 COSTS OF $ 135.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # ING255441005 . HEARING SET FOR 05/23/13 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEMOLI AVENUE HOMEWONERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant