Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 11:35:01 (UTC).

LEILA SHAYESTEHKHOU VS ASN WOODLAND HILL EAST LLC

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 LEILA SHAYESTEHKHOU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASN WOODLAND HILL EAST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1000

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAYESTEHKHOU LEILA

Defendant

ASN WOODLAND HILL EAST LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

9/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/28/2020

10/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/28/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

6/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

6/19/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/6/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

4/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

3/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/27/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LEILA SHAYESTEHKHOU on 02/27/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 10/28/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: LEILA SHAYESTEHKHOU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/24/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/27/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAddress for LEILA SHAYESTEHKHOU (Plaintiff) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LEILA SHAYESTEHKHOU (Plaintiff); As to: ASN WOODLAND HILL EAST LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASN WOODLAND HILLS EAST LLC is a litigant