This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2021 at 10:24:03 (UTC).

LEIGH ANN ORSI VS CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 LEIGH ANN ORSI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4978

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORSI LEIGH ANN

Defendant

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC. DBA SPECTRUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMAN WHITNEY

Defendant Attorney

CHEE LAUREN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance - Notice of Appearance

12/31/2020: Notice of Appearance - Notice of Appearance

Answer - Answer Second Amended

8/25/2020: Answer - Answer Second Amended

Answer - Answer

8/3/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice (name extension) - Notice DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

8/3/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

Answer - Answer

7/24/2020: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer Amended

8/3/2020: Answer - Answer Amended

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6/25/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/15/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/15/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/15/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer Second Amended; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer Amended; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/16/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Leigh Ann Orsi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC04978    Hearing Date: April 15, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., April 15, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Orsi v. Charter Communications, Inc. COMPL. FILED: 06-15-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC04978 DISC. C/O: 11-13-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 11-28-21

TRIAL DATE: 12-13-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ADJUDICATION

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Leigh Ann Orsi

RESP. PARTY: Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. dba Spectrum

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

(CCP § 437c)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Leigh Ann Orsi’s Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Adjudication is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Because this Court does not have jurisdiction to issue permanent injunctive relief as prayed for in the Complaint, the action is RECLASSIFIED as an unlimited jurisdiction case and is transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of notice of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 75/80 Day Lapse (CCP 12c and 1005 (b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on April 1, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: None filed as of April 13, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On June 15, 2020, Plaintiff Leigh Ann Orsi (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for violation of the Rosenthal Fair Debt Collection Practices Act and violations of the California Invasion of Privacy Act against Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. dba Spectrum (“Defendant”).

Defendant filed an Answer on July 24, 2020, an Amended Answer on August 3, 2020, and a Second Amended Answer on August 25, 2020.

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Adjudication (the “Motion”) on January 19, 2021. Defendant filed an Opposition on April 1. No reply brief was filed.

As an initial matter, the Court notes that Plaintiff seeks injunctive relief. Specifically, Plaintiff seeks both preliminary and permanent injunctive relief prohibiting Defendant from recording telephone conversations without first informing and receiving consent from other parties, including Plaintiff. (Compl., p. 10, ¶¶ C, D; p. 12, ¶¶ B, C.)

However, limited jurisdiction courts, such as this one, do not have the authority to issue permanent injunctive relief. (Code Civ. Proc., § 86, subd. (a)(8) [“An action to issue a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction” is a limited civil case].) Thus, this Court has no jurisdiction over this action.

Accordingly, the Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication, is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The Court also RECLASSIFIES this action to unlimited jurisdiction court on its own motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 403.040, subdivision (a). Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

  1. Conclusion & Order

Plaintiff Leigh Ann Orsi’s Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Adjudication is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Because this Court does not have jurisdiction to issue permanent injunctive relief as prayed for in the Complaint, the action is RECLASSIFIED as an unlimited jurisdiction case and is transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of notice of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEE LAUREN