This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2021 at 01:41:59 (UTC).

LEE REINIS, ET AL. VS GOLDEN CROSS CARE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 LEE REINIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GOLDEN CROSS CARE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8640

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REINIS LEE

AARRIS HEALTHCARE LLC

Defendants

1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC

ROBERTSON MARLENE

AREVALO JOSE

GOLDEN CROSS CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REINIS MITCHELL NEIL

Defendant Attorney

FREEMAN JORDAN M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/11/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/11/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/11/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/11/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer - Answer

2/1/2021: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/13/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/13/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/13/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Hearing04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Golden Cross Care, Inc. (Defendant); 1450 North Fair Oaks LLC (Defendant); Marlene Robertson (Defendant); Jose Arevalo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Marlene Robertson (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/03/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Arevalo (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/03/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: 1450 North Fair Oaks LLC (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/03/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Golden Cross Care, Inc. (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/03/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Golden Cross Care, Inc. (Defendant); 1450 North Fair Oaks LLC (Defendant); Marlene Robertson (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Golden Cross Care, Inc. (Defendant); 1450 North Fair Oaks LLC (Defendant); Marlene Robertson (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lee Reinis (Plaintiff); Aarris Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Golden Cross Care, Inc. (Defendant); 1450 North Fair Oaks LLC (Defendant); Marlene Robertson (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABIITY COMPANY DBA GOLDEN CROS HEALTH CARE is a litigant