Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2017 at 10:11:44 (UTC).

LAVITEX INC VS GRAND APPAREL GROUP INC. DBA PUZZLES

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 LAVITEX INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRAND APPAREL GROUP INC DBA PUZZLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2015

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAVITEX INC

2268 E. 15Th St.,

Los Angeles, CA 90021

Defendant

GRAND APPAREL GROUP INC. DBA PUZZLES

3022 S. Grand Ave,

Los Angeles, CA 90007

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017

9/7/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/7/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

2/28/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/28/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/28/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 06/27/2017

6/27/2017: Minute Order of 06/27/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/5/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/2/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/2/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

5/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 06/27/2017 to 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: blank; Result Date changed from 06/27/2017 to 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 09/07/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 09/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: LAVITEX INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LAVITEX INC (Plaintiff); As to: grand apparel group inc. dba puzzles (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/15/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170228E9363 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170228E9363 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LAVITEX INC (Plaintiff); As to: grand apparel group inc. dba puzzles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAVITEX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant