This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 09:23:12 (UTC).

LAUREN D. MEADOWS, ET AL. VS VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 LAUREN D MEADOWS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7206

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEADOWS LAUREN D.

MEADOWS SUZANNE E.

Defendant

VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

12/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/22/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2021

6/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lauren D. Meadows, et al. on 12/22/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 06/11/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 06/11/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Lauren D. Meadows (Plaintiff); Suzanne E. Meadows (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Lauren D. Meadows (Plaintiff); Suzanne E. Meadows (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lauren D. Meadows (Plaintiff); Suzanne E. Meadows (Plaintiff); As to: Valley Active Properties LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY ACTIVE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant