This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 07:09:14 (UTC).

LAURAN CUNNINGHAM, ET AL. VS STANISLAV FILATOV, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 LAURAN CUNNINGHAM filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against STANISLAV FILATOV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0399

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CUNNINGHAM PATRICK

CUNNINGHAM LAURAN

Respondents

FILATOV STANISLAV

HOME REMODELING GIANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROGOFF PAUL JASON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/31/2020

8/31/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/31/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/31/2020

8/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/31/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/12/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/4/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

7/23/2020: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CNFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

6/2/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CNFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

1/30/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

1/30/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 09/01/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/09/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/31/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCP00399, 20STCP00350 are related; case number 20STCP00350 is the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: LAURAN CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); PATRICK CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); As to: STANISLAV FILATOV (Respondent); HOME REMODELING GIANT (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 08/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/01/2020 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: STANISLAV FILATOV (Respondent); HOME REMODELING GIANT (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/11/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LAURAN CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); PATRICK CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); As to: STANISLAV FILATOV (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/10/2020; Service Cost: 83.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LAURAN CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); PATRICK CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); As to: HOME REMODELING GIANT (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/10/2020; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LAURAN CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); PATRICK CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); As to: STANISLAV FILATOV (Respondent); HOME REMODELING GIANT (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: LAURAN CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); PATRICK CUNNINGHAM (Petitioner); As to: STANISLAV FILATOV (Respondent); HOME REMODELING GIANT (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP00399    Hearing Date: September 01, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., September 1, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Cunningham, et al. v. Filatov, et al. PET. FILED: 01-30-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP00399

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioners Lauran Cunningham and Patrick Cunningham

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

To allow the Court time to issue a ruling on the Notice of Related Case filed by Respondents on July 23, 2020 for Case No. 20STCP00350, Home Remodeling Giant, et al. v. Cunningham, et al., the hearing on Petitioners Lauran and Patrick Cunningham’s Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO Nov 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of August 28, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of August 28, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On January 30, 2020, Petitioner Lauran Cunningham and Patrick Cunningham (collectively, “Petitioners”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”) against Respondents Stanislav Filatov (“Filatov”) and Home Remodeling Giant (“Home Remodeling”) (collectively, “Respondents”).

Two days before this Petition was filed, Respondents filed a Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award against Respondent Lauran Cunningham, Case No. 20STCP00350, which is currently scheduled for hearing for November 9, 2020 in this Department. On July 23, 2020, Respondents filed a Notice of Related Case for Case No. 20STCP00350.

Thus, this hearing is CONTINUED to Nov 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to allow time for the Court to make a determination as to the relatedness of the instant action and Case No. 20STCP00350.

  1. Conclusion & Order

To allow the Court time to issue a ruling on the Notice of Related Case filed by Respondents on July 23, 2020 for Case No. 20STCP00350, Home Remodeling Giant, et al. v. Cunningham, et al., the hearing on Petitioners Lauran and Patrick Cunningham’s Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO Nov 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.