This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2020 at 15:09:39 (UTC).

LATERAL LINK GROUP, INC. VS LINKEDIN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LATERAL LINK GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LINKEDIN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3601

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LATERAL LINK GROUP INC.

Defendant

LINKEDIN CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/24/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/24/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/15/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/24/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 01/24/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Lateral Link Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: LinkedIn Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lateral Link Group, Inc. on 12/06/2019 as follows: Defendant LinkedIn Corporation does not owe the plaintiff Lateral Link Group, Inc. any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Lateral Link Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: LinkedIn Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lateral Link Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: LinkedIn Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STSC13601    Hearing Date: March 09, 2020    Dept: 40

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Maria E. Amezquita Espinoza,

Denisse Suales Aguago, and

Cecilio Suales

OPPOSITION: Defendant General Motors, LLC

The Court’s December 27, 2019 discovery order required Defendant to produce verified Code-compliant responses and documents responsive to RFP Nos. 1, 7, 9, 46, 48, 49, 50, 51, and 70 within 45 days of the Informal Discovery Conference (“IDC”) per stipulation of the parties and to comply with the Court’s “Song-Beverly Discovery” within 45 days of the IDC.

Plaintiffs state that Defendant has failed to abide by the discovery order. Plaintiffs request that the Court order immediate compliance and prospective sanctions of $500 per day.

The Court considered the moving papers, the opposition, and the reply, and rules as follows.

Standard: CCP § 128 provides in relevant part that:

(a) Every court shall have the power to do all of the following:

(4) To compel obedience to its judgments, orders, and process, and to the orders of a judge out of court, in an action or proceeding pending therein.

Analysis: Defendant argues that the instant motion is moot because on February 27, 2020, they complied with the December 2019 Joint Discovery Order.

Plaintiffs claim that Defendants have failed to comply with Request No. 7, which requests Warranty Policies and Procedure Manuals, because they have failed to produce warranty policy and procedure manuals for the years 2012, 2013, 2018, and 2020. Plaintiffs also state that the manuals Defendant has produced are all first edition and it is unclear if there are other editions.

Plaintiffs allege that Defendant has failed to comply with Request Nos. 48, 49, 50, and 51, which seek documents regarding Defendant’s handling of lemon law and customer complaints. Plaintiffs states that Defendant merely refers them to a batch of documents Bates Nos. GM 005321 – GM 005363 as being responsive.

Plaintiffs allege that Defendant has failed to comply Request No. 70, which seeks Defendant’s recall policy and procedure. Plaintiffs state that Defendant has failed to comply and instead filed an objection.

Finally, Plaintiffs states that Defendant has failed to comply with the Song-Beverly Discovery Order by failing to produce certain documents.

The Court finds that the motion is moot as Defendant has complied with the December 2019 order.

Conclusion: Plaintiffs’ motion to compel compliance is MOOT.