This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2020 at 03:59:55 (UTC).

LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III, ET AL. VS DONEISHA BRADLEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DONEISHA BRADLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3337

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMAS DASHAWNA

MARSHALL III LARRY CHARLES

Defendants

TAYLOR AARON JAMES

BRADLEY DONEISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WON HELEN

Defendant Attorney

HONG LYNDON

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/6/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise; Order to...) of 10/08/2020

10/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise; Order to...) of 10/08/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise; Order to...)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise; Order to...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

5/7/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/1/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pe...)

7/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pe...)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

8/23/2019: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/23/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Answer - Answer

5/14/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

4/4/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/4/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/4/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • Hearing04/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous): Filed By: DASHAWNA THOMAS (Plaintiff),LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise; Order to...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise; Order to...) of 10/08/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise scheduled for 10/08/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/08/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/08/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/13/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: DASHAWNA THOMAS (Plaintiff),LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 10/02/2020 to 10/06/2020; Result Date changed from 10/06/2020 to 10/06/2020; As To Parties changed from LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff) to LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); DASHAWNA THOMAS (Plaintiff); As to: LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise scheduled for 10/08/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); As to: DONEISHA BRADLEY (Defendant); Service Date: 04/13/2019; Service Cost: 33.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); As to: AARON JAMES TAYLOR (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/13/2019; Service Cost: 64.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); DASHAWNA THOMAS (Plaintiff); As to: DONEISHA BRADLEY (Defendant); AARON JAMES TAYLOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); DASHAWNA THOMAS (Plaintiff); As to: DONEISHA BRADLEY (Defendant); AARON JAMES TAYLOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LARRY CHARLES MARSHALL III (Plaintiff); DASHAWNA THOMAS (Plaintiff); As to: DONEISHA BRADLEY (Defendant); AARON JAMES TAYLOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03337    Hearing Date: October 08, 2020    Dept: 26

Marshall III, et al. v. Bradley, et al.

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF A MINOR 

The Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor is DENIED.

Discussion

On April 4, 2019, Plaintiffs Larry Charles Marshall III (“Petitioner”) and Dashawna Thomas filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendants Doniesha Bradley and Aaron James Taylor (“Defendants”). Petitioner filed the instant Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Petition”) on behalf of Claimant Ryan Marshall (“Claimant”) on May 7, 2020.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim.  (Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372.) “‘[W]ithout trial court approval of the proposed compromise of the ward’s claim, the settlement cannot be valid.  [Citation.]  [¶] Nor is the settlement binding [on the minor] until it is endorsed by the trial court.’”  (Pearson v. Superior Court (2012) 202 Cal.App.4th 1333, 1338.) A minor, like Claimant, “shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 372, subd. (a)(1).) Alternatively, the petitioner may file a declaration demonstrating that he or she has a right to compromise the minor’s claim under Cal. Probate Code section 3500.

The Court issued a ruling on July 1, 2020 regarding several defects in the Expedited Petition and set the matter for hearing on October 8, 2020. (Minute Order, 7/1/20.) The Court ordered Petitioner to file and serve supplemental papers correcting the defects at least 16 court days prior to the hearing date and warned that failure to do so might result in the Expedited Petition being placed off calendar or denied. (Ibid.) To date, no supplemental papers have been filed.  

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, the Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor is DENIED.

Court clerk to give notice.