This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2017 at 21:08:14 (UTC).

LANA MCLEOD VS UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 LANA MCLEOD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5359

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCLEOD LANA

Los Angeles, CA 90047

Defendants

UNIVERSAL RECOVERY

UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION

2880 Sunrise Blvd., #138

Rancho Cordova, CA 95742

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/20/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

7/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Unknown

8/7/2017: Unknown

[Request for Court Order and Answer]

9/12/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/12/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017

9/12/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017

Unknown

9/12/2017: Unknown

[Order on Request for Court Order]

9/26/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]

Unknown

9/26/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/14/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/14/2017

11/14/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/14/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: As to: Universal Recovery Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Universal Recovery Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Lana McLeod (Plaintiff); As to: Universal Recovery Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lana McLeod (Plaintiff); As to: Universal Recovery (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lana McLeod (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015493 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from LANA MCLEOD vs UNIVERSAL RECOVERY to LANA MCLEOD vs UNIVERSAL RECOVERY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lana McLeod (Plaintiff); As to: Universal Recovery Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Recovery, Inc. is a litigant