This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 07:17:26 (UTC).

LAMOND AKINS VS EULA ARMSTRONG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 LAMOND AKINS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EULA ARMSTRONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0423

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AKINS LAMOND

Defendants

ARMSTRONG EULA

ARMSTRONG EL MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020

5/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/12/2020

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/12/2020

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/19/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/11/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/11/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • Hearing06/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/30/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/12/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/12/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: LAMOND AKINS (Plaintiff); As to: EULA ARMSTRONG (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LAMOND AKINS (Plaintiff); As to: EL MICHAEL ARMSTRONG (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LAMOND AKINS (Plaintiff); As to: EULA ARMSTRONG (Defendant); EL MICHAEL ARMSTRONG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: LAMOND AKINS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: LAMOND AKINS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.