This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2017 at 04:04:34 (UTC).

LAHAINA ARANETA VS OSCAR SILVA

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 LAHAINA ARANETA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OSCAR SILVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN L. BERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5661

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN L. BERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARANETA LAHAINA

Defendant

SILVA OSCAR

 

Court Documents

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/31/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Unknown

7/31/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Payment Due

7/31/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

8/21/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/25/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017

9/25/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017

(Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

9/25/2017: (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/25/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/25/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/25/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/25/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to court order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 11:00 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 09/25/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 11:00 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/25/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Lahaina Araneta against Defendant Oscar Silva on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lahaina Araneta on 07/31/2017 for the principal amount of $7,500.00 and costs of $154.00 for a total of $7,654.00, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lahaina Araneta (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Silva (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/03/2017; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lahaina Araneta (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Silva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less