This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2017 at 21:01:35 (UTC).

LAGUNAS, FRANCISCO VS. JONES, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 LAGUNAS, FRANCISCO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONES, KEVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1393

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAGUNAS FRANCISCO

Defendants

JONES KEVIN

JONES CHRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/01/17 , FOR (LAGUNAS, FRANCISCO) , AGAINST (JONES, KEVIN) , (JONES, CHRISTINA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 414 N ROSE AVE #B COMPTON, CA 90221 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 36.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SASE . RECEIPT # NOR626335031 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (JONES, KEVIN) , (JONES, CHRISTINA) OTHER TENANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JONES, KEVIN) . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (JONES, CHRISTINA) . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF PLTFS COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 415.46 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (JONES, KEVIN) , (JONES, CHRISTINA) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (JONES, CHRISTINA) DUE TO FORWARD TIME XP/ JONES CHRISTINA L/ 15606 S VERMONT AVE/ GARDENA CA 90247-4120 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NOR509405002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/19/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SEF . D.S .

    Read MoreRead Less