This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 01:01:58 (UTC).

LA VINA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS GREEN, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 11/04/2015 LA VINA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GREEN, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7839

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA VINA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

GREEN JOSEPH

GREEN JENNIE SPENCER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL M

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/4/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($75.00)

11/20/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($75.00)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($25.00)

11/20/2015: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($25.00)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/25/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

1/26/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

4/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer

4/17/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request for Court Order

5/4/2017: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

5/4/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

6/29/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/29/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Daisy Flores

6/29/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Daisy Flores

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/29/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/29/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/29/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

9/22/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Substitution of Attorney

9/22/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

11/8/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (LA VINA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) (Plaintiff); As to: JOSEPH GREEN (Defendant); JENNIE SPENCER GREEN (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 11/08/2017 ; Status Date changed from 06/29/2017 to 11/08/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 11/08/2017 ; Status Date changed from 11/08/2017 to 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Daniel M Medioni (Attorney); As to: (LA VINA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/29/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: (LA VINA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LA VINA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) . MELISSA PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE THE FULL TERMS OF SETTLEMENT. PARTIES SETTLE THE CASE AS SET FORTH IN THE MEDIATION AGREEMENT. ALL PARTIES ARE GIVEN COPIES OF THE SIGNED AGREEMENT IN OPEN COURT. CLERK SHALL GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GREEN, JOSEPH) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/25/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 . COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GREEN, JENNIE SPENCER) BY SUB-SERVING JOSEPH GREEN . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/25/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899012. HEARING SET FOR 01/25/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.