This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:10:23 (UTC).

LA SHAWNA BERTRAND VS SANDRA COLAGIACOMI

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 LA SHAWNA BERTRAND filed an Other lawsuit against SANDRA COLAGIACOMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2797

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERTRAND LA SHAWNA

Respondent

COLAGIACOMI SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ASCHERIN PRESTON K.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/14/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order) of 10/01/2020

10/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order) of 10/01/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)

10/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATIO...)

9/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATIO...)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITION PENDING DETERMINATION OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDE

9/8/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITION PENDING DETERMINATION OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDE

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/31/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Petition

8/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Petition

Petition (name extension) - Petition Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief

8/31/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/31/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

9/1/2020: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF PRESTON K. ASCHERIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS

9/2/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF PRESTON K. ASCHERIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS

Motion for Protective Order - Motion for Protective Order

9/2/2020: Motion for Protective Order - Motion for Protective Order

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF ERIC M. LEVINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

9/2/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF ERIC M. LEVINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF LA SHAWNA BERTRAND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

9/2/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF LA SHAWNA BERTRAND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRO P. PACHECO SUPPORTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITION PENDING DETERMINATION OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

9/3/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF ALEJANDRO P. PACHECO SUPPORTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITION PENDING DETERMINATION OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by La Shawna Bertrand on 08/31/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by La Shawna Bertrand as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAddress for Preston K. Ascherin (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order) of 10/01/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Protective Order scheduled for 10/01/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/01/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/01/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITION PENDING DETERMINATION OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Filed by: La Shawna Bertrand (Petitioner); As to: Sandra Colagiacomi (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Protective Order scheduled for 10/01/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING DEPOSITION PENDING DETERMINATION OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: Filed By: La Shawna Bertrand (Petitioner); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATIO...)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: La Shawna Bertrand (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order Staying Deposition Pending Determination of Motion for Protective Order and Notice of Ex Parte Application scheduled for 09/03/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief; Filed by: La Shawna Bertrand (Petitioner); As to: Sandra Colagiacomi (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: La Shawna Bertrand (Petitioner); As to: Sandra Colagiacomi (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: La Shawna Bertrand (Petitioner); As to: Sandra Colagiacomi (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP02797    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: 26

Bertrand v. Colagiacomi, et al.

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2025.310(b), 2025.420)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner La Shawna Bertrand’s Motion for Protective Order and for Monetary Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Based on the relief sought in the Petition, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Petitioner is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

ANALYSIS:

On August 31, 2020, Petitioner La Shawana Bertrand (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition for Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Relief against Respondent Sandra Colagiacomi (“Respondent”). The Petition seeks injunctive relief and declaratory relief “[e]njoining respondent from deposing petitioner in person while California Emergency Rule 11(a) remains in effect” and “[d]eclaring petitioner is not required to attend deposition in person while California Emergency Rule 11(a) remains in effect.” (Pet., Prayer, ¶¶1-2.) To date, no proof of service of the Summons and Petition has been filed with respect to Respondent.

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court has no authority to issue declaratory or injunctive relief, subject to certain exceptions that are not applicable here. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86.) Based on the relief sought in the Petition and pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 403.040, subdivision (a), this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Petitioner is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

Court clerk to give notice.