This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2020 at 18:12:17 (UTC).

LA PARK LA BREA A, LLC VS SKYLER ARIEL MANN

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 LA PARK LA BREA A, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SKYLER ARIEL MANN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0996

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA PARK LA BREA A LLC

Defendant

MANN SKYLER ARIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

12/23/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

12/23/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

12/23/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/11/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Skyler Ariel Mann)

11/14/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Skyler Ariel Mann)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

11/14/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

11/12/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/12/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Skyler Ariel Mann (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff La Park La Brea A, LLC against Defendant Skyler Ariel Mann on the Complaint filed by La Park La Brea A, LLC on 11/12/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 6220 West 3rd Street #215, Los Angeles, CA 90036 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Skyler Ariel Mann (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 138.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Skyler Ariel Mann (Defendant); Service Date: 11/16/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 11/16/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Skyler Ariel Mann; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by La Park La Brea A, LLC on 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Skyler Ariel Mann (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Skyler Ariel Mann (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Skyler Ariel Mann (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: La Park La Brea A, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Skyler Ariel Mann (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA PARK LA BREA A LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO