This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 02:40:15 (UTC).

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3047

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC DBA IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE CENTER

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TYLER ELIZABETH PLOTT

JOHNSON MARK A.

Defendant Attorney

MCELROY LESLIE PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

8/5/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Request for Refund / Order - Request for Refund / Order

10/20/2020: Request for Refund / Order - Request for Refund / Order

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

5/14/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order Continuing Trial to February 1, 2022

5/20/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Order Continuing Trial to February 1, 2022

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Date

8/17/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Date

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

1/24/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/3/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

5/1/2019: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Reassignment of Case within the Office of the Attorney General, Counsel for Defendant California Department of Public Health

5/3/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Reassignment of Case within the Office of the Attorney General, Counsel for Defendant California Department of Public Health

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

General Denial - General Denial

1/14/2019: General Denial - General Denial

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/23/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/23/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/23/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/23/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by La Mirada Healthcare, LLC on 10/23/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by La Mirada Healthcare, LLC as to California Department of Public Health

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAddress for Mark A. Johnson (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: La Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Continuing Trial to February 1, 2022; Filed by: California Department of Public Health (Defendant); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: California Department of Public Health (Defendant); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/01/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Refund / Order: Filed By: California Department of Public Health (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/29/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: California Department of Public Health (Defendant); As to: La Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: La Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: La Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant); Service Date: 12/17/2018; Service Cost: 69.16; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: La Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: California Department of Public Health (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: La Mirada Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less