This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 10:43:41 (UTC).

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1046

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC

LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC DBA IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE CENTER

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER & WILSON LLP

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY CHRISTINE M

 

Court Documents

Summons

9/7/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/7/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - (Amended)

9/7/2016: Complaint - (Amended)

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

11/2/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

Amended Complaint - (Amended)

11/9/2016: Amended Complaint - (Amended)

(name extension) - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

11/9/2016: (name extension) - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

11/15/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

Response (name extension) - GENERAL DENIAL

11/23/2016: Response (name extension) - GENERAL DENIAL

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE /1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

11/28/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE /1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/5/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

12/19/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/17/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/7/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order - to Judge Pines, Dept. 76, Mosk

3/7/2018: Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order - to Judge Pines, Dept. 76, Mosk

Notice of Settlement - of Entire Case

3/8/2018: Notice of Settlement - of Entire Case

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/8/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/08/2018

3/8/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/08/2018

Request for Dismissal

5/8/2018: Request for Dismissal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department 77 to Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2018 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2018 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/08/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by: LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC (Plaintiff); Settlement Type: Unconditional; Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/08/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/07/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 09/09/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LA MIRADA HEALTHCARE LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less