This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2017 at 11:09:41 (UTC).

KYUNG S NIA TEXTILE,INC VS MOON UP IN THE SKY,INC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 KYUNG S NIA TEXTILE,INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOON UP IN THE SKY,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6556

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIA TEXTILE INC KYUNG S

2900 S. Santa Fe Ave.#12,

Vernon, CA 90058

Defendant

MOON UP IN THE SKY INC DBA MIRACLE BERRY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2017

9/6/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/6/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/12/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/06/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 09/06/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170713E6244 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170713E6244 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: KYUNG S NIA TEXTILE,INC (Plaintiff); As to: MOON UP IN THE SKY,INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOON UP IN THE SKY INC is a litigant