Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 12:39:49 (UTC).

KY NGUYEN, ET AL. VS DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 KY NGUYEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2643

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NGUYEN KY

TRAN MAI

Defendant

HERNANDEZ MENDEZ DAVID

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

2/1/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

2/2/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

12/10/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/9/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/10/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: KY NGUYEN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/02/2021 ; Status Date changed from 12/10/2020 to 02/02/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/02/2021 ; Status Date changed from 12/10/2020 to 02/02/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: MAI TRAN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketOther - Exhibits Receipt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff KY NGUYEN against Defendant DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by KY NGUYEN, et al. on 09/23/2020 for the principal amount of $6,000.00 and costs of $55.00 for a total of $6,055.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MAI TRAN against Defendant DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by KY NGUYEN, et al. on 09/23/2020 for the principal amount of $3,500.00 and costs of $55.00 for a total of $3,555.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: KY NGUYEN (Plaintiff); MAI TRAN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/12/20; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: KY NGUYEN (Plaintiff); MAI TRAN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID HERNANDEZ MENDEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less