This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 01:35:56 (UTC).

KSM HEALTHCARE INC., A CORPORATION VS SYNERMED, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 KSM HEALTHCARE INC , A CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SYNERMED, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4289

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KSM HEALTHCARE INC. A CORPORATION

1400 W Glenoaks Blvd

Glendale, CA 91201

Defendants

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC A CORPORATION

7700 Forsyth Blvd Ste 800

St Louis, MO 63105

SYNERMED A CORPORATION

711 W College St Ste 628

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/17/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2018

12/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2018

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/19/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/19/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/11/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

10/11/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/11/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by KSM HEALTHCARE INC., a corporation on 10/11/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 12/17/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/17/2018 08:30 AM at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: KSM HEALTHCARE INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC, a corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: KSM HEALTHCARE INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SYNERMED, a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/15/2018; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: KSM HEALTHCARE INC., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SYNERMED, a corporation (Defendant); HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNERMED INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KSM HEALTHCARE INC. DBA DREIER'S NURSING CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant