This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 20:22:49 (UTC).

KRYSTEL MARIE BLUNT VS ARTURO PERALES

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 KRYSTEL MARIE BLUNT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARTURO PERALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3950

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUNT KRYSTEL MARIE

Long Beach, CA 90808

Defendant

PERALES ARTURO

Long Beach, CA 90810

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/6/2017: Unknown

[Notice of Rejection]

8/16/2017: [Notice of Rejection]

Unknown

8/16/2017: Unknown

EXHIBITS RECEIPT

7/31/2017: EXHIBITS RECEIPT

Minute Order of 07/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/7/2017: Minute Order of 07/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/7/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

7/7/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/6/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/8/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/10/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/10/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/10/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Krystel Marie Blunt (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Perales (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/06/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/07/2017 to 09/06/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Krystel Marie Blunt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Krystel Marie Blunt against Defendant Arturo Perales on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Krystel Marie Blunt on 04/10/2017 for the principal amount of $9,698.07 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $9,813.07.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Arturo Perales (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170416E5413 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170416E5413 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Krystel Marie Blunt (Plaintiff); As to: Arturo Perales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less