This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2020 at 02:54:58 (UTC).

KOOGWON MIKE KWUN VS 714 OXFORD SQUARE HOMEOWERS ASSOCIATION, A CORP.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 KOOGWON MIKE KWUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against 714 OXFORD SQUARE HOMEOWERS ASSOCIATION, A CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9500

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KWUN KOOGWON MIKE

Defendant

714 OXFORD SQUARE HOMEOWERS ASSOCIATION A CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BAE YOUNG HO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/5/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/14/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

1/14/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

1/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/14/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

12/3/2019: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

12/3/2019: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/23/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (As to: Non-party)

10/23/2019: Other - (name extension) - Other - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (As to: Non-party)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/5/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/28/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Young Ho Bae (Attorney); As to: 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff Koogwon Mike Kwun against Defendant 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Koogwon Mike Kwun on 08/28/2019 for the principal amount of $820.87 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $910.87.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Koogwon Mike Kwun on 08/28/2019, judgment entered on 11/05/2019 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Koogwon Mike Kwun on 08/28/2019, judgment entered on 11/05/2019 as to 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 01/14/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 11/05/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Koogwon Mike Kwun (Plaintiff); As to: 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketOther - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (As to: Non-party); Filed by: Koogwon Mike Kwun (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Other - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (As to: Non-party): Name Extension changed from (As to: Non-party) to Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (As to: Non-party); Document changed from Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) to Other - (name extension); As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Other - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (As to: Non-party): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. (Defendant) to 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Koogwon Mike Kwun (Plaintiff); As to: 714 Oxford Square Homeowers Association, A Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAE YOUNG HO