This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2016 at 06:49:41 (UTC).

KOENIG, GINA VS HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC

Case Summary

On 03/27/2014 KOENIG, GINA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRY H JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2569

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOENIG GINA

Defendants

HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION INC.

WYLE LABORATORIES INC.

BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY

JOH HARRY H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (WYLE LABORATORIES, INC.) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/23/14 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPARTMENT NE2 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/23/14 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPARTMENT NE2 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC.) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/23/14 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPARTMENT NE2 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1140329E8027. HEARING SET FOR 06/23/14 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wyle Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Harry H. Joh Construction Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT is a litigant