This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2017 at 06:36:37 (UTC).

KNR SLIDING DOOR DESIGN VS MANNY REGALADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2017 KNR SLIDING DOOR DESIGN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANNY REGALADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1562

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNR SLIDING DOOR DESIGN DBA KNR SLIDING DOORS

Defendant

REGALADO MANNY AKA MANNY REGALADO MR INTERIOR DESIGN AKA MANNY REGALADO MRID

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/14/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/14/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/10/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

2/14/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

3/14/2017: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

4/10/2017: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/14/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/10/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: KNR Sliding Door Design (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: KNR Sliding Door Design (Plaintiff); As to: Manny Regalado (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims); Filed by: KNR Sliding Door Design (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170217E8040 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170217E8040 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: KNR Sliding Door Design (Plaintiff); As to: Manny Regalado (Defendant); Manny Regalado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.