Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 05:15:36 (UTC).

KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 KNB ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6770

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KNB ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BACK JONG HEE

KIM SANG TAI

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LEE FREDERICK W

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHEN CHAD

WANG CHARLIE Y.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/13/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Great Eastern Enterprises, In...)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Great Eastern Enterprises, In...)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Great Eastern Enterprises, Inc's Ex Parte Application To Shorten Time For Hearing Of A Motion to Compel Further Responses To Requests For P

9/2/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Great Eastern Enterprises, Inc's Ex Parte Application To Shorten Time For Hearing Of A Motion to Compel Further Responses To Requests For P

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/3/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Request for Special Interrogatories

9/29/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Request for Special Interrogatories

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents

9/29/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents

Reply (name extension) - Reply Great Eastern Enterprises, Inc.'s Reply to KNB Enterprises, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories And In Support of Request

10/5/2020: Reply (name extension) - Reply Great Eastern Enterprises, Inc.'s Reply to KNB Enterprises, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories And In Support of Request

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

10/3/2019: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/30/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - Answer

8/30/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Date; Signed and Filed by: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 05/17/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/02/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses: Filed By: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 10/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses: Filed By: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 10/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Sang Tai Kim (Cross-Defendant); Jong Hee Back (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/02/2019; Service Cost: 66.67; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KNB ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: GREAT EASTERN ENTERPRISES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06770    Hearing Date: October 13, 2020    Dept: 26

KNB Enterprises, Inc. v. Great Eastern Enterprises, Inc. et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2033.290, 2030.300, 2031.310)

TENTATIVE RULING:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNB ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE FREDERICK W.