This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 21:22:17 (UTC).

KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE VS IAX CORP.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2013 KNAPP, PETERSEN CLARKE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IAX CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7763

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Defendants

KOLOSKY RICHARD J.

IAX CORP. A NEVADA CORPORATION DBA IAX CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HERZLICH & BLUM, LLP - ALLAN HERZLICH

Attorney at HERZLICH & BLUM, LLP

HERZLICH ALLAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/1/2018: Notice of Ruling

Order

1/30/2018: Order

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Assignment Order)

1/30/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Assignment Order)

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

7/3/2013: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/28/2014: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Default Judgment

3/26/2014: Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

3/7/2014: Request for Dismissal - Without Prejudice - Does/Roes [Inclusive] Only

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/7/2014: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons

5/10/2013: Summons

Declaration - re: Computation of Interest

3/7/2014: Declaration - re: Computation of Interest

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

7/3/2013: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Declaration - Re: SUPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/7/2014: Declaration - Re: SUPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Other - - SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/7/2014: Other - - SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/27/2013: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/19/2013: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/12/2013: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/14/2013: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/19/2013: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: (KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE) A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Assignment Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion re: MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER: Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Assignment Order scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 01/30/2018; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketASSIGNMENT ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: RICHARD J. KOLOSKY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SAN FRANCISCO); Issued by: Clerk; County: SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Assignment Order scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketMotion re: MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER; Filed by: (KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE) A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: (IAX CORP.) A NEVADA CORPORATION (Defendant); RICHARD J. KOLOSKY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketNotice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; Filed by: (KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE) A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: (IAX CORP.) A NEVADA CORPORATION (Defendant); RICHARD J. KOLOSKY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE) A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: (IAX CORP.) A NEVADA CORPORATION (Defendant); RICHARD J. KOLOSKY (Defendant); Interest: 8,990.03; Service Date: 11/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (IAX CORP.), A NEVADA CORPORATION AND DBA (IAX CORPORATION) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KOLOSKY, RICHARD J.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (IAX CORP.), A NEVADA CORPORATION AND DBA (IAX CORPORATION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY GRACIELA FREIXES TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/05/14 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY GRACIELA FREIXES TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/05/14 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN 24. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE) A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

P 0\\’L09

ENCINO GATEWAY BUILDING

15760 VENTURA BOULEVARD, SUITE 2024 John A, Clarke, Executive Qfficer/Clerk ENCINO, CALIFORNIA 91436-3095 By/V) #Mgc&{ Deputy a garcia

Telephone (818) 783-8991 Facsimile (818) 783-6682 Allan Herzlich State Bar #100920 Jerome J. Blum State Bar #100317

Attorneys for Plaintiff

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT/ CHATSWORTH COURTHOUSE 13007763

KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE, a CASE NO. California Professional Corporation, Limited Civil Jurisdiction Plaintiff,

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

(Over $10,000.00)

1. Breach of Contract 2. Quantum Meruit 3. Open Book Account

IAX CORP., a Nevada corporation and dba IAX Corporation; RICHARD J. KOLOSKY, an individual; DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Defendants.

N’ N N’ e N e’e’ gt g’ s’ e’

Plaintiff KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKE, a California Professional Corporation,

alleges:

1. Plaintiff is a professional corporation comprised of attorneys at law duly licensed to practice before each of the Courts of the State of California. /1

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZLICH ALLAN