This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 00:54:10 (UTC).

KLEIN, ALLYSON VS CARRICO, LOLITA

Case Summary

On 09/09/2015 KLEIN, ALLYSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARRICO, LOLITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4715

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLEIN ALLYSON

Defendant

CARRICO LOLITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DENNIS P. BLOCK AND ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK ESQ

Attorney at DENNIS P. BLOCK AND ASSOCIATES

BLOCK DENNIS P. ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 150.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . PUT IN THE BOX...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:55A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING RYAN BLOCK, ESQ. (X) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS : FOR PLAINTIFF ALLYSON KLEIN AND AGAINST DEFENDANT LOLITA CARRICO. :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/27/15 , FOR (KLEIN, ALLYSON) , AGAINST (CARRICO, LOLITA) , PAST DUE RENT $ 4500.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 7500.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 350.00 . TOTAL $ 12,850.00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 4312 CHASE AVENUE LOS ANGELES, CA 90066 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 10:55A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING RYAN BLOCK, ESQ. (X) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 10/27/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT WES . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CARRICO, LOLITA) . RECEIPT # SM210969004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/07/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.