This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 14:18:33 (UTC).

KLACP II, LLC VS KYOUNG SOOK WON

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 KLACP II, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against KYOUNG SOOK WON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0648

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLACP II LLC

Defendants

LEE SANDRA S.

OK WOO MYONG

WON KYOUNG SOOK

PARK STEVE H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KING ALLEN

BLOCK DENNIS P

AWA NNANA

Defendant Attorney

GRIGORYAN HAYK

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/16/2021: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/16/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Non-Jury Trial)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Request for Admissions; Hearing o...)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Request for Admissions; Hearing o...)

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Request for Production and Copies

1/25/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Request for Production and Copies

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Request for Admissions

1/25/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Request for Admissions

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories

1/25/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF TRIAL

1/14/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF TRIAL

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

12/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference re: Non-Jury Trial;)

12/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference re: Non-Jury Trial;)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/17/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Kyoung Sook Won)

1/22/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Kyoung Sook Won)

Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

2/5/2020: Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

Answer - Answer

2/5/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

3/2/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

3/2/2020: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91 updated: Result Date to 03/17/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff KLACP II, LLC against Defendant Kyoung Sook Won, Defendant Sandra S. Lee, Defendant Steve H. Park and Defendant Woo Myong Ok on the Complaint filed by KLACP II, LLC on 01/17/2020 for holdover damages $9,333.10, attorney fees of $500.00, and costs of $375.00 for a total of $10,208.10.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 924 S. Park View Street, Los Angeles, CA 90006 is granted for plaintiff(s);; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Amended Motion to Compel Request for Admissions: Filed By: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Amended Motion to Compel Request for Production: Filed By: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Withdrawn; Result Date: 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Amended Motion to Compel Request for form interrogatories: Filed By: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Withdrawn; Result Date: 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Sandra S. Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KLACP II, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kyoung Sook Won (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING ALLEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AWA NNANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.