Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 14:06:52 (UTC).

KINGSWAY GARDENS MOBILE HOME ESTATES, L.P. VS PEARL SAURENMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 KINGSWAY GARDENS MOBILE HOME ESTATES, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PEARL SAURENMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0166

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINGSWAY GARDENS MOBILE HOME ESTATES L.P.

Defendants

SAURENMAN PEARL

La Verne, CA 91750

SAURENMAN JACOB

La Verne, CA 91750

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS JAMES

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

5/3/2018: Writ - Return

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/6/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/9/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

3/9/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Ruling - and Proof of Service

2/23/2018: Notice of Ruling - and Proof of Service

Opposition (name extension) - to Defendnant's Demurrer to Complaint;Points and Authorities in Support thereof

2/15/2018: Opposition (name extension) - to Defendnant's Demurrer to Complaint;Points and Authorities in Support thereof

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/18/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

1/12/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

1/12/2018: Complaint

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/17/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/17/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/12/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Pearl Saurenman)

1/12/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Pearl Saurenman)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/12/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/12/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketAddress for Chris James Evans (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Kingsway Gardens Mobile Home Estates, L.P. against Defendant Pearl Saurenman and Defendant Jacob Saurenman on the Complaint filed by Kingsway Gardens Mobile Home Estates, L.P. on 01/12/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 2755 Arrow Highway, #154, La Verne, CA 91750 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Kingsway Gardens Mobile Home Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 33.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession (forward to sheriff); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Chris James Evans (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kingsway Gardens Mobile Home Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Pearl Saurenman (Defendant); Service Date: 01/13/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kingsway Gardens Mobile Home Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Jacob Saurenman (Defendant); Service Date: 01/13/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Pearl Saurenman (Defendant); Jacob Saurenman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kingsway Gardens Mobile Home Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff); As to: Pearl Saurenman (Defendant); Jacob Saurenman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kingsway Gardens Mobile Home Estates, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINGSWAY GARDENS MOBILE HOME ESTATES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS