This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 00:15:21 (UTC).

KIMISHA GILL VS PAIGE SHANNON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 KIMISHA GILL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAIGE SHANNON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5899

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILL KIMISHA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DEMIRJIAN LILIT

SHANNON WENDY

SHANNON PAIGE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SHANNON WENDY

SHANNON PAIGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

NWABUZOR EMMANUEL

OGUNNUBI MELISSA

SANTOS PATRICK THOMAS

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

SANTOS PATRICK THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions

8/5/2021: Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Answer - Answer

1/7/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

6/24/2020: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

6/24/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/26/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

11/23/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

11/23/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/15/2020

12/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/15/2020

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/18/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

6/18/2019: Complaint - Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for 11/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMotion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 06/03/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 02/08/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 02/08/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 02/08/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff); As to: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant); LILIT DEMIRJIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff); As to: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant); LILIT DEMIRJIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KIMISHA GILL (Plaintiff); As to: PAIGE SHANNON (Defendant); WENDY SHANNON (Defendant); LILIT DEMIRJIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05899    Hearing Date: June 3, 2021    Dept: 26

Gill v. Shannon, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Emmanuel Nwabuzor, Esq.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff Kimisha Gill is CONTINUED TO AUGUST 5, 2021. AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE, MOVING PARTY IS TO FILE (1) PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE MOTION AND NEW HEARING DATE ON ALL PARTIES; AND (2) PROPOSED ORDER ON JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM MC-053. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE MOTION BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR OR DENIED.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

Case Number: 19STLC05899    Hearing Date: February 08, 2021    Dept: 26

Gill v. Shannon, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Paige Shannon’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Kimisha Gill to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Kimisha Gill to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Kimisha Gill to Respond to Request for Production, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $705.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant Paige Shannon (“Defendant Paige”) propounded Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production, Set One, on Plaintiff Kimisha Gill (“Plaintiff”) on June 24, 2020. (Motions, Ogunnubi Decl., Exh. A.) Following Plaintiff’s failure to provide timely responses, Defendant Paige twice extended the deadline to serve verified responses. (Id. at Exhs. B-D.) Following no response from Plaintiff after the last deadline, Defendant Paige filed the instant Motions to Compel Responses and Request for Sanctions on November 23, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Based on the Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the propounded discovery, Defendant Paige is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to serve verified responses to the interrogatories and request for production without objections.

Plaintiff’s failure to timely respond constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030 and have been properly noticed for each motion. Therefore, the request for sanctions is granted against Plaintiff in the total amount of $705.00 based on three hours of attorney time billed at $175.00 an hour and $180.00 in costs. (Motions, Ogunnubi Decl., ¶8.)

Conclusion

Defendant Paige Shannon’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Kimisha Gill to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Kimisha Gill to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Kimisha Gill to Respond to Request for Production, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $705.00 TO DEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGUNNUBI MELISSA