Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:37:38 (UTC).

KIM STAMPS VS GEORGE FELIX MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by KIM STAMPS against GEORGE FELIX MENDOZA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0103

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAMPS KIM

Defendant

MENDOZA GEORGE FELIX

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/05/2018

11/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/05/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/5/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kim Stamps on 09/10/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/05/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 11/05/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Kim Stamps (Plaintiff); As to: George Felix Mendoza (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/06/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kim Stamps (Plaintiff); As to: George Felix Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less