This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2016 at 19:28:45 (UTC).

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII, LLC VS. BEAUTY BEYOND TIME ENTERPRISES

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BEAUTY BEYOND TIME ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0713

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII LLC DBA WARNER BUSINESS PARK EAST

Defendants

BEAUTY BEYOND TIME ENTERPRISES INC.

OHAYON OREN DBA ATTITUDELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - JACK LEVY

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/03/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO POSSESSION ONLY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY RETURNED FILED; NO SERVICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/20/14 , FOR (KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII, LLC) DBA (WARNER BUSINESS PARK EAST) , AGAINST (BEAUTY BEYOND TIME ENTERPRISES INC.) , (OHAYON, OREN) DBA (ATTITUDELINE) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 21228 VANOWEN STREET CANOGA PARK, CA 91303 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 161.10 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . BASKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (BEAUTY BEYOND TIME ENTERPRISES INC.) , (OHAYON, OREN) DBA (ATTITUDELINE) UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (OHAYON, OREN) DBA (ATTITUDELINE) . COSTS OF $ 52.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BEAUTY BEYOND TIME ENTERPRISES INC.) , (OHAYON, OREN) DBA (ATTITUDELINE) ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (BEAUTY BEYOND TIME ENTERPRISES INC.) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (OHAYON, OREN) DBA (ATTITUDELINE) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM519607009.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/13/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIDS FROM THE VALLEY VII LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY JACK INC