This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 02:25:39 (UTC).

KHADIJAH STEPTOE VS MAKENNA BROWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 KHADIJAH STEPTOE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAKENNA BROWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3817

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPTOE KHADIJAH

Defendants

BROWN JEFF

BROWN JENNIFER

BROWN MAKENNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON WILL L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/18/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/17/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/17/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/17/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Updated -- WILL L. JOHNSON (Attorney): First Name changed from WILL to WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Address for WILL L. JOHNSON (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: KHADIJAH STEPTOE (Plaintiff); As to: MAKENNA BROWN (Defendant); JEFF BROWN (Defendant); JENNIFER BROWN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • On the Complaint filed by KHADIJAH STEPTOE on 04/17/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by KHADIJAH STEPTOE as to JEFF BROWN, JENNIFER BROWN, and MAKENNA BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: KHADIJAH STEPTOE (Plaintiff); As to: MAKENNA BROWN (Defendant); JEFF BROWN (Defendant); JENNIFER BROWN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KHADIJAH STEPTOE (Plaintiff); As to: MAKENNA BROWN (Defendant); JEFF BROWN (Defendant); JENNIFER BROWN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KHADIJAH STEPTOE (Plaintiff); As to: MAKENNA BROWN (Defendant); JEFF BROWN (Defendant); JENNIFER BROWN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03817    Hearing Date: September 16, 2020    Dept: 31

PHILIP JOHN HILDEBRAND,

Plaintiff,

v.

LITTLE BEACH HOUSE MALIBU, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 19STLC02817

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

INITIAL NOTE: This is not a tentative ruling. It is being posted with the tentative rulings to give Counsel notice not to appear. This is a final order and the case is being transferred.

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled related cases are complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

These related cases are hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE WEST DISTRICT, JUDGE MARK EPSTEIN presiding in DEPT. R of the SANTA MONICA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: September 16, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON WILL L.