This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 11:10:41 (UTC).

KEVIN WALKER VS KARINA NOELLE CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 KEVIN WALKER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KARINA NOELLE CASTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4560

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER KEVIN

Defendant

CASTILLO KARINA NOELLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

11/22/2019: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

11/26/2019: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/10/2020

1/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/10/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/05/2020

3/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/05/2020

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/5/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

11/26/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/18/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/31/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Kevin Walker (Plaintiff on defendant's claim); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/05/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketOn the Defendant's Claim filed by Karina Noelle Castillo on 11/22/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Kevin Walker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kevin Walker on 10/31/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Karina Noelle Castillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/05/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 03/05/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/05/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant on defendant's claim); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01/10/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: Kevin Walker (Plaintiff on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Kevin Walker (Plaintiff); As to: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kevin Walker (Plaintiff); As to: Karina Noelle Castillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less