This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2019 at 12:01:48 (UTC).

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #II, A CORPORATION VS VELTA LYNN QUINTANA

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE II, A CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VELTA LYNN QUINTANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4011

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #II A CORPORATION

Defendant

QUINTANA VELTA LYNN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/15/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/14/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

8/6/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/6/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kenny's Auto Service #II, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kenny's Auto Service #II, a corporation on 08/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Kenny's Auto Service #II, a corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kenny's Auto Service #II, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Velta Lynn Quintana (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/13/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kenny's Auto Service #II, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Velta Lynn Quintana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #H is a litigant