This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2019 at 11:57:08 (UTC).

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #II, A CORPORATION VS MIGUEL GONZALES

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, II, A CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIGUEL GONZALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5823

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #II A CORPORATION

Defendant

GONZALES MIGUEL

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/12/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/12/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/12/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/2/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kenny's Auto Service, #II, A Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kenny's Auto Service, #II, A Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Gonzales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kenny's Auto Service, #II, A Corporation on 11/12/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Kenny's Auto Service, #II, A Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #H is a litigant