This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2019 at 12:45:53 (UTC).

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, #II, A CORPORATION VS CAR FINANCE CAPITAL

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE, II, A CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAR FINANCE CAPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1303

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #II A CORPORATION

Defendant

CAR FINANCE CAPITAL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/25/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/11/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Kenny's Auto Service, #II, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kenny's Auto Service, #II, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Car Finance Capital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Kenny's Auto Service, #II, a Corporation on 03/11/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Kenny's Auto Service, #II, a Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENNY'S AUTO SERVICE #H is a litigant