This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 01:32:04 (UTC).

KENNY BUCKNER VS CALLAGHAN RICHARD DAVID MCDONOUGH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 KENNY BUCKNER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CALLAGHAN RICHARD DAVID MCDONOUGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9975

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCKNER KENNY

Defendants

MCDONOUGH CALLAGHAN RICHARD DAVID

MCDONOUGH KELLY F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SANTIAGO CHRISTEN DENISE

IVORY ROBIN

Other Attorneys

YEAGER KENNETH C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

1/20/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

5/3/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POIN

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

5/3/2021: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

6/1/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/2/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/2/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses

7/1/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

7/1/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/5/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kenny Buckner on 11/30/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Kenny Buckner as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/05/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/05/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kenny Buckner (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly F. McDonough (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kenny Buckner (Plaintiff); As to: Callaghan Richard David McDonough (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kenny Buckner (Plaintiff); As to: Callaghan Richard David McDonough (Defendant); Kelly F. McDonough (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kenny Buckner (Plaintiff); As to: Callaghan Richard David McDonough (Defendant); Kelly F. McDonough (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kenny Buckner (Plaintiff); As to: Callaghan Richard David McDonough (Defendant); Kelly F. McDonough (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC09975 Hearing Date: July 6, 2021 Dept: 26

Due to Court\'s unavailability, Hearings on Motions to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"), previously set on 07/06/2021 have been reset for hearing on 08/05/2021 at 10:00 a.m.'

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH