This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 22:41:14 (UTC).

KENNETH BUCALO VS PATRICIA BETHUNE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 KENNETH BUCALO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PATRICIA BETHUNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9208

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCALO KENNETH

Defendant

BETHUNE PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLUCK STEVEN MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

SIMON DAWN T

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

10/23/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - complaint

9/20/2017: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - complaint

Summons - on Complaint

7/28/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/28/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/28/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Steven Martin Gluck (Attorney): Organization Name: Law Offices of Steven M. Gluck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kenneth Bucalo (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Bethune (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike: Location changed from Department 77 to Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kenneth Bucalo on 07/28/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to Patricia Bethune

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 10/23/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike complaint; Filed by: Patricia Bethune (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kenneth Bucalo (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Bethune (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kenneth Bucalo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON DAWN T.