This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 03:14:33 (UTC).

KENITA NICHOLS VS ANTOINETTE DANIELLE MORRIS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 KENITA NICHOLS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANTOINETTE DANIELLE MORRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1567

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

N KENITA NICHOLS

Defendant

MORRIS ANTOINETTE DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/25/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • Hearing12/18/2020 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kenita N, Nichols (Plaintiff); As to: Antoinette Danielle Morris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Kenita N, Nichols (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Kenita N, Nichols (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Antoinette Danielle Morris (Defendant) to Antoinette Danielle Morris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Antoinette Danielle Morris (Defendant) to Antoinette Danielle Morris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/18/2020 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket** Case Name changed from KENITA N, NICHOLS vs ANTOINETTE DANIELLE MORRIS to KENITA NICHOLS vs ANTOINETTE DANIELLE MORRIS

    Read MoreRead Less