This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 08:17:57 (UTC).

KEN WONG VS WEI MEN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 KEN WONG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WEI MEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0175

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONG KEN

Defendant

MEN WEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ALLEN K

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

6/16/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/21/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/21/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

1/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Wei Men)

1/22/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Wei Men)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/22/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

2/6/2020: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/5/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

3/5/2020: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/5/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/5/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

3/6/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Filed By: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); As to: Wei Men (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 48.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); As to: Wei Men (Defendant); Mailing Date: 02/07/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); As to: Wei Men (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Wei Men; On the Complaint filed by Ken Wong on 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Ken Wong against Defendant Wei Men on the Complaint filed by Ken Wong on 01/21/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 425 E Mission Rd #C, San Gabriel, CA 91776 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Signed and Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); As to: Wei Men (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); As to: Wei Men (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); As to: Wei Men (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ken Wong (Plaintiff); As to: Wei Men (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ALLEN KENT