This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2016 at 14:38:00 (UTC).

KEH, STEVE VS RON, YORAM

Case Summary

On 07/12/2012 KEH, STEVE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RON, YORAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5095

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KEH STEVE

MCMURRAY MEGAN

Defendants

RON YORAN

CB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

RON YORAM

Cross Plaintiff

YORAM RON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERKE, JEFF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

OMRANI, SEPEHR

Cross Defendant Attorneys

HAKIMI, HELGA

BERKEHAKIMI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2014
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 08/04/14 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/04/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • A/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/01/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 11/05/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT F46 * * VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • EFFECTIVE 04/22/13 CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • IN DEPT. 77 AT 8:30 A.M. FUTURE HEARING DATE(S) REMAIN THE SAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • SERVICE BY MAIL ON 02/11/13 TO JEFF BERKE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant