This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2019 at 04:54:17 (UTC).

KEEL, TYRONE A. VS ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.IN

Case Summary

On 04/10/2014 KEEL, TYRONE A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAY SANTANA and RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3099

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAY SANTANA

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEEL TYRONE A.

Defendants

ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.

ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS. INC. NIGOL MANOUKIAN ATTORNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING . RESPONDENT APPEARING. BY ABRAHAM AKHOIAN WITH COUNSEL NIGOL MANOUKIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) . ABRAHAM AKHOIAN, CEO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 07/11/14 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE PLANTIFF(S)/RESPONDENT(S) SHALL HAVE AND RECOVER NOTHING BY THIS ACTION, AND THAT THE DEFENDANT(S)/APPELLANT(S) SHALL HAVE JUDGMENT FOR COSTS IN THE SUPERIOR COURT IN THE SUM OF $ .00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) . RECEIPT # LAV485216009 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 07/11/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP OF THE VAN NUYS SUPERIOR COURT - EAST BUILDING, 3RD FLOOR, ROOM 300 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. RAY SANTANA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/05/14 . FOR (KEEL, TYRONE A.) . AGAINST (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 3300.00 . COSTS $ 110.00 . TOTAL $ 3410.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 . SERVED BY SHERIFF'S DEPT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS.INC.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • AMENDMENT TO /P FILED INSERTING IN PLACE AND STEAD OF INCORRECT/FICTITIOUS NAME ROOTER MASTER INC. THE TRUE NAME OF ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SVCS. INC. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV532305028 . HEARING SET FOR 06/05/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING is a litigant