Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2018 at 08:02:22 (UTC).

KATIE LAMB VS PAYPAL HOLDINGS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 KATIE LAMB filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAYPAL HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0406

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAMB KATIE

Las Vegas, NV 89183

Defendant

PAYPAL HOLDINGS INC.

2211 North First Street,

San Jose, CA 95131

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/8/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/08/2018

1/8/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/08/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/8/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/2/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

10/27/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/27/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/08/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 01/08/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Katie Lamb (Plaintiff); As to: Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Katie Lamb (Plaintiff); As to: Paypal Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paypal Holdings Inc is a litigant